Accounts and annual returns BAGSHOT PLAYING FIELDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 274653
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 18 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 18 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 08 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 11 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 11 February 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2017 02 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 05 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required