THE SOCIETY OF ST PIUS X

Charity number: 274695
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 21 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 21 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 27 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 27 September 2017 On time Download