BARRIE BADLAND TRUST

Charity number: 275063
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020
Total gross income £1.84k £2.19k £2.33k £2.24k £3.65k
Total expenditure £180 £5.73k £0 £1.26k £1.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A