BARRIE BADLAND TRUST

Charity number: 275063
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
  • 27 February 1978: Standard registration
  • 22 July 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 07 December 2011: Re-registered
  • 09 July 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 17 August 2015: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • THE MECHANICAL SERVICES TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property