BEDELSFORD SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 275419
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 30 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 24 October 2020 86 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 05 November 2019 98 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 29 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 15 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required