BEDELSFORD SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 275419
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £5.58k £11.43k £18.02k £24.75k £7.32k
Total expenditure £3.16k £7.43k £3.22k £2.58k £1.41k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A