Accounts and annual returns WILLIAM JOHN MILLS COTTAGES

Charity number: 275488
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2022 05 December 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 05 December 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 06 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 06 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 30 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 30 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 30 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 13 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 13 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window