Financial history WILLIAM JOHN MILLS COTTAGES

Charity number: 275488
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £191.95k £194.72k £194.03k £222.41k £251.74k
Total expenditure £117.87k £128.26k £144.96k £159.57k £258.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A