HASTINGS TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 276105
Charity reporting is overdue by 33 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 33 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 33 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 06 March 2020 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 23 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 03 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required