HASTINGS TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 276105
Charity reporting is overdue by 37 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £3.18k £140 £1.29k £1.18k £1.10k
Total expenditure £9.63k £11.68k £1.36k £9.45k £3.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A