THE DUKE OF LANCASTER'S REGIMENT LANCASHIRE INFANTRY MUSEUM

Charity number: 276150
Charity reporting is up to date (125 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £37.91k £53.81k £38.58k £55.25k £45.54k
Total expenditure £35.10k £26.79k £30.28k £48.24k £33.98k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A