Financial history WELLS OPERATIC SOCIETY LTD

Charity number: 276308
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £64.22k £58.86k £51.60k £14.68k £54.50k
Total expenditure £59.22k £52.54k £55.14k £26.13k £38.57k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £10.00k £25.67k