Accounts and annual returns WELLS OPERATIC SOCIETY LTD

Charity number: 276308
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 16 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 16 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 02 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 02 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 04 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

04 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window