Financial history CLUB 77 TETBURY FOR THE DISABLED

Charity number: 276328
Charity reporting is overdue by 75 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022
Total gross income £1.06k £1.01k £502 £0 £334
Total expenditure £1.42k £669 £602 £132 £192
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A