FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S CHURCH, STOUGHTON

Charity number: 276584
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £10.17k £6.91k £7.24k £8.74k £5.84k
Total expenditure £3.08k £233 £12.99k £206 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A