FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S CHURCH, STOUGHTON

Charity number: 276584
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHARLES HENRY HUNTLY LAWTON Chair 18 April 2012 None on record
NEIL HAWORTH Trustee 01 February 2021 None on record
PETER JAMES HUGHES Trustee
WALDERTON STOUGHTON AND RACTON VILLAGE HALL TRUST Received: On time
JACQUELINE SHERLING Trustee 28 June 2018 None on record
Olivia Pemberton Trustee 10 May 2016 None on record
ROBERT ALISTAIR SADLER Trustee None on record
Rosamund Claire Veltom Trustee 05 February 2020 None on record