ST JOSEPH'S COLLEGE READING TRUST

Charity number: 277077
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
HILARY BUCKLE Trustee None on record
DAVID IRVING GEORGE HALLE Chair None on record
Jonathan Hennah Trustee 30 January 2015 None on record
Prof Francoise Le Saux Trustee 16 January 2020 None on record
JULIA FEENEY Trustee 16 May 2013 None on record
SISTER HELEN-MARIE Trustee
SISTERS OF MERCY (COMMUNITY ESTABLISHED AT WOODLEY)
Dr MARGARET ELIZABETH CROSS Trustee None on record
Simon Wilson Trustee 01 September 2020
GODALMING OPERATIC SOCIETY Received: On time
Justin Derek Ronald Snoxall Trustee 12 February 2019 None on record
Stephen William Slack Trustee 01 January 2020 None on record
Leo Ring Trustee 03 March 2020 None on record
Paul Adrian Barras Trustee 26 September 2017 None on record
Giles Peter Francis Watson Trustee 07 February 2017 None on record