TREGADILLETT AND DISTRICT AGE CONCERN COMMITTEE

Charity number: 277103
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 10 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 13 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 02 January 2020 124 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 07 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 23 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required