TREGADILLETT AND DISTRICT AGE CONCERN COMMITTEE

Charity number: 277103
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £21.34k £4.64k £5.19k £12.68k £11.36k
Total expenditure £5.85k £18.74k £6.28k £11.00k £3.56k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £2.90k £10.00k