THE CITY OF ELY COMMUNITY SERVICE COMMITTEE

Charity number: 277107
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 30 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 18 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 06 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 19 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 10 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required