Financial history SOUTH ASIA ARCHIVE AND LIBRARY GROUP

Charity number: 277132
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 27/10/2016 27/10/2017 27/10/2018 27/10/2019 27/10/2020
Total gross income £716 £390 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £818 £313 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A