FRIENDS OF GOLDINGTON ACADEMY

Charity number: 277320
Charity reporting is overdue by 812 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017
Total gross income £6.41k £7.24k £6.71k £11.34k £5.74k
Total expenditure £6.43k £38 £8.20k £11.27k £3.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A