RAVENSCOTE PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 277432
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £61.53k £62.54k £56.02k £49.69k £30.37k
Total expenditure £54.93k £59.23k £60.22k £46.47k £32.84k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A