THE JOHNSON TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 277439
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Victoria Padgham Trustee 01 February 2019 None on record
SUSAN KOWSZUN Trustee 24 March 2017 None on record
RICHARD HENRY JULIAN VENABLES KYRKE Chair None on record
ELIZABETH LAWRENCE Trustee 29 June 2011 None on record
James Cooper Trustee 23 June 2014 None on record
Dr Jonathan Slater Trustee 05 February 2021 None on record
NIC KARONIAS Trustee 30 October 2012 None on record
SUSAN SAYER CBE Trustee 29 June 2011 None on record
JOHN RODERICK HALL Trustee 30 October 2012 None on record
HUGH PHILLIPS Trustee 25 June 2013 None on record
Jonathan Scrase Trustee 24 March 2017 None on record
Robert Norton Trustee 23 June 2014 None on record
Andrew Hayes Trustee 24 June 2016 None on record