Financial history THE JUBILEE SAILING TRUST

Charity number: 277810
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £4.36m £3.75m £4.07m £3.12m £2.11m
Total expenditure £4.53m £4.98m £4.34m £3.56m £2.32m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £269.63k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.46m £1.73m £2.36m £2.06m £1.21m
Income - Other trading activities £49.13k £38.44k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.83m £1.93m £1.67m £1.04m £668.23k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £124 £25 £112 £0 £0
Income - Other £16.44k £58.23k £39.85k £18.31k £223.68k
Income - Legacies £128.00k £181.57k £162.80k £204.63k £399.15k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.94m £4.49m £3.89m £3.19m £2.07m
Expenditure - Raising funds £557.22k £458.94k £451.40k £372.75k £253.38k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £30.22k £22.64k £0 £0 £0