OUTREACH 3 WAY

Charity number: 278140
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £5.48m £5.87m £5.84m £6.20m £6.62m
Total expenditure £5.27m £5.63m £5.47m £6.09m £6.34m
Income from government contracts £4.96m £5.49m £5.50m £5.87m £6.21m
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £44.00k £3.00k £18.00k £24.00k £36.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £5.44m £5.87m £5.82m £6.17m £6.58m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.27m £5.63m £5.47m £6.09m £6.34m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £3.00k £6.00k £3.00k £51.00k £4.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0