MICHAEL B HACKER CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT

Charity number: 278182
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £138 £113 £52 £130 £145
Total expenditure £3.12k £32.45k £9.32k £13.28k £43.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A