Accounts and annual returns THE KISHARON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 278369
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 11 July 2023 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 11 July 2023 11 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 18 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 18 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 01 July 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 01 July 2021 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 20 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 20 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window