18TH IPSWICH (HOLYWELLS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 278515
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Other income £20.21k £15.39k £13.79k £15.81k £12.50k
Total expenditure £18.82k £14.93k £15.48k £14.44k £13.43k