Accounts and annual returns CAMBRIDGESHIRE & HUNTINGDONSHIRE FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity number: 278815
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 17 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 May 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 11 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 11 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 22 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 22 August 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 18 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 18 August 2017 On time Download Open in new window