Financial history CAMBRIDGESHIRE & HUNTINGDONSHIRE FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity number: 278815
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £37.49k £38.95k £32.05k £29.19k £37.51k
Total expenditure £25.31k £33.11k £57.67k £78.51k £51.29k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A