THE D G RYDER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 278933
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 October 2020 21 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 October 2019 16 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 October 2018 30 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 October 2017 09 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 01 October 2016 27 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2016 Not Required