THE D G RYDER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 278933
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/10/2016 01/10/2017 01/10/2018 01/10/2019 01/10/2020
Total gross income £24.27k £20.20k £18.58k £18.50k £12.11k
Total expenditure £2.07k £7.35k £42.82k £48.20k £12.70k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A