Financial history ST MARK'S SCHOOL HOUSE TRUST

Charity number: 278938
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022
Total gross income £5.96k £5.71k £5.63k £5.16k £4.92k
Total expenditure £720 £1.19k £720 £4.22k £3.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A