CHARITY OF MARY BARNES

Charity number: 279055
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 05 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 23 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 14 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required