CHARITY OF MARY BARNES

Charity number: 279055
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £4.79k £4.36k £4.47k £4.30k £4.47k
Total expenditure £12.00k £6.50k £5.00k £5.00k £2.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A