ST SWITHUN'S CHURCH, EAST GRINSTEAD, RESTORATION TRUST

Charity number: 279191
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stephen Douglas Fallowell Chair 26 November 2018 None on record
Stephen John Linton Trustee 03 June 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST SWITHUN, EAST GRINSTEAD. Received: On time
Rev ANDREW ROBERT HAWKEN BD AKC Trustee 28 November 2016
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST SWITHUN, EAST GRINSTEAD. Received: On time
JOHN MICHAEL CRAWFORD POPE Trustee 19 February 2015 None on record
Dorothy Lynn Ellis Trustee 27 November 2017
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST SWITHUN, EAST GRINSTEAD. Received: On time
LLOYD MARTIN RICHARDS MBE, ACIB Trustee 19 February 2015
THE EAST GRINSTEAD COMMON GOOD TRUST Received: On time
John Bryant Trustee 03 June 2021 None on record