THE GEORGE AND MARY CROSFIELD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 279427
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £8.40k £8.40k £8.00k £6.00k £6.00k
Total expenditure £8.62k £8.50k £6.76k £6.61k £6.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A