THE FRIENDS OF ST MICHAEL'S CHURCH, ST ALBANS

Charity number: 279810
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £10.62k £10.62k £759 £3.31k £1.18k
Total expenditure £1.61k £1.61k £201 £15 £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A