THE GIRLS' BRIGADE INTERNATIONAL COUNCIL

Charity number: 279811
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 07 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 22 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 22 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 25 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 25 September 2017 On time Download