THE GIRLS' BRIGADE INTERNATIONAL COUNCIL

Charity number: 279811
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £34.31k £85.42k £40.44k £30.34k £33.69k
Total expenditure £24.02k £36.05k £30.71k £46.85k £25.95k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A