Financial history 2ND CORRINGHAM SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 279877
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £33.75k £5.93k £14.16k £22.94k £4.43k
Total expenditure £36.06k £5.89k £4.96k £5.01k £5.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £11.33k £22.94k N/A