Trustees 2ND CORRINGHAM SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 279877
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Victoria Lloyd Chair 03 September 2017
None on record
Matthew Patel Trustee 01 May 2018
None on record
Steven Alan Pryer Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record
Hazel Marie Fay Trustee 29 June 2017
None on record
MRS A WAREHAM Trustee 09 August 2012
None on record
MR A SKINNER Trustee
None on record
MRS C SKINNER Trustee
None on record
MRS A TOMLIN Trustee
None on record