ST BERNADETTES PARENT-TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 279966
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/08/2020
Total gross income £27.78k £24.52k £24.53k £24.87k £8.72k
Total expenditure £29.11k £29.35k £26.75k £26.31k £18.04k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A