TAVISTOCK AREA DISABLED FELLOWSHIP CLUB

Charity number: 280156
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 24 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 15 July 2019 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 12 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 21 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2015 24 December 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2015 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)