TAVISTOCK AREA DISABLED FELLOWSHIP CLUB

Charity number: 280156
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/07/2015 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019
Total gross income £896 £767 £1.70k £794 £953
Total expenditure £1.88k £1.34k £1.89k £1.78k £2.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A