BEN URI GALLERY AND MUSEUM LIMITED

Charity number: 280389
Charity reporting is up to date (144 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 June 2021 144 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 01 June 2021 121 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 March 2020 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 03 March 2020 32 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 March 2019 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 25 February 2019 25 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 03 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 03 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 January 2017 On time Download