BEN URI GALLERY AND MUSEUM LIMITED

Charity number: 280389
Charity reporting is up to date (144 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £672.84k £640.91k £349.71k £1.69m £290.44k
Total expenditure £648.75k £425.05k £453.83k £321.60k £311.76k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £611.14k £560.27k N/A £460.48k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £80.64k N/A £15.00k N/A
Income - Charitable activities £61.70k £0 N/A £1.22m N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A £1.49k N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A £2.50k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £538.37k £265.34k N/A £297.27k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £110.38k £159.71k N/A £24.33k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £4.25k £2.75k N/A £3.04k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A