THE ST JAMES'S TRUST SETTLEMENT

Charity number: 280455
Charity reporting is up to date (53 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 02 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 30 March 2021 53 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 12 November 2020 281 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 30 March 2021 419 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 12 November 2020 646 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 12 November 2020 646 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 01 May 2018 85 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 04 February 2019 364 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 08 March 2017 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 19 June 2017 134 days late Download