THE ST JAMES'S TRUST SETTLEMENT

Charity number: 280455
Charity reporting is up to date (53 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £86.22k £66.29k £62.64k £54.59k £67.56k
Total expenditure £492.51k £342.05k £146.38k £93.38k £220.77k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A